MA S1420 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2565
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to equitable firearm license fees. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to equitable firearm license fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2565 |
2019-08-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-08-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2685 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S790 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H3431 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2118 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2684 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3353 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S199 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H2100 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S943 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H280 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1241 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S790 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
H3431 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2118 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H1863 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2684 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3353 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S199 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H2100 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S943 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H280 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1420 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1420.pdf |