MA S95 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2533

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote livable communities. Community Development and Small Businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote livable communities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2533
2019-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses

Same As/Similar To

S2091 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S1651 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S449 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - House concurred
S2533 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback