MA S2359 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2763

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on September 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote community immunity. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting community immunity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2763
2020-04-27HouseHouse concurred
2020-04-23SenateReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-10HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-06SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-12-02JointHearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-11-21JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 11:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-09-30HouseHouse concurred
2019-09-26SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-09-26SenateRules suspended
2019-09-05SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3999 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2763 (Replaced by) 2020-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback