MA H3999 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to vaccination and immunization for school admittance. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to vaccinations and public health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-12-02JointHearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-11-21JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 11:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-08-05SenateSenate concurred
2019-08-01HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-07-25SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-27HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education
2019-06-13HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback