MA S1363 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to temporary waiver of interest and penalties for late payment of certain local assessments during the COVID-19 epidemic. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to temporary waiver of interest and penalties for late payment of certain local assessments during the COVID-19 epidemic
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3702 (Similar To) 2021-05-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2021
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2400 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1888 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1552 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H494 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H488 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S410 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2396 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1344 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S2472 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3771 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Text of amendment, see H3702
H3872 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Published as amended, see H3874
H3874 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - See S2472
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2400 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S1897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H1888 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1552 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H494 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
H488 (Similar To) 2022-07-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4968
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S410 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S250 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4938
S2289 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1193 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H5055 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2396 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1344 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1363 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1363.pdf |