MA S926 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen the penalty for assault or assault and battery on emergency medical technician, ambulance operator, ambulance attendant or health care provider. The Judiciary.
Title
Strengthening the penalty for assault or assault and battery on emergency medical technician, ambulance operator, ambulance attendant or health care provider
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S190 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1888 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4013 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2021
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
H2302 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1128 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1821
S1012 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1752 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1552 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1888 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4013 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2021
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
S176 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
H2302 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S1194 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1128 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1821
S1012 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1752 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1552 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S926 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S926.pdf |