US SB3640 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 155 South Main Street in Mount Clemens, Michigan, as the "Lieutenant Colonel Alexander Jefferson Post Office".
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 155 South Main Street in Mount Clemens, Michigan, as the "Lieutenant Colonel Alexander Jefferson Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-04-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2993; consideration: CR S2993) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 327. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |