US HB2499 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out an information technology system and prioritize certain requirements to manage supply chains for medical facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
VA Supply Chain Management System Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Keith Self [R-TX] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523. |
2024-08-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-625. |
2024-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-19 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-19 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |