US SB3639 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2075 West Stadium Boulevard in Ann Arbor, Michigan, as the "Robert Hayden Post Office".
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 2075 West Stadium Boulevard in Ann Arbor, Michigan, as the "Robert Hayden Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2024-09-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-09-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5569) |
2024-09-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3639. |
2024-09-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5569-5570) |
2024-09-23 | House | Mr. LaTurner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-04-26 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-04-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2993; text: CR S2993) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 326. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |