CA AB2621 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13519.6 and 18108 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement training.
Title
Law enforcement training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2621 Gabriel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13519.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |