OH HB251 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-17)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5534.423 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 88 in Portage County as the "Patrolman James R. Wert Memorial Highway."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Patrolman James R. Wert Memorial Highway

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-24SenateReferred to committee: Transportation
2023-12-19SenateIntroduced
2023-12-13HousePassed
2023-12-12HouseReported - Substitute: Rules and Reference
2023-12-07HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2023-10-02HouseReported: Transportation
2023-09-12HouseReferred to committee: Transportation
2023-08-01HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5534423New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/hb251
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/hb251/IN/00/hb251_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/hb251/RH/01/hb251_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/hb251/RH/02/hb251_02_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_135/bills/hb251/PH/03/hb251_03_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21316&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21324&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21437&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21462&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21923&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21927&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21920&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21914&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21918&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21966&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=21992&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/135/hb251/votes

Bill Comments

feedback