MA H1552 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to instituting the death penalty for the murder of law enforcement officers. The Judiciary.
Title
Instituting the death penalty for the murder of law enforcement officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1507 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2456 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2807 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1537 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S998 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1538 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2568 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2456 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2807 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1537 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S998 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1538 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2568 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1552 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1552.pdf |