MA S2400 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2680

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for a waiver of a certain payment of dues for veterans and active and retired Armed Forces members. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a waiver of a certain payment of dues for veterans and active and retired Armed Forces members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2680
2021-12-28JointHearing scheduled for 01/07/2022 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S2462 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2455 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4060 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S2409 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3454 (Similar To) 2021-07-20 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H4201 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S410 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
S1733 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2771
S868 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Senate concurred
S2680 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback