US HB3433 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 594.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 594.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to molecularly targeted pediatric cancer investigations, and for other purposes.
Title
Give Kids a Chance Act of 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 594. |
2024-09-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-700. |
2024-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 0. |
2024-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 11. |
2024-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2897 (Same As) 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1214 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109.
HB7383 (Related) 2024-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1214 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109.
HB7383 (Related) 2024-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.