MA H2707 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creditable service for retirement purposes for certain service in the armed forces of the United States. Public Service.
Title
Relative to creditable service in the armed forces of the United States
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2569 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2707 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2707.pdf |