CA SB1207 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3501 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Buy Clean California Act: eligible materials.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3529.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 3501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |