MA S2455 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to 100% disabled veteran motor vehicle tax exemptions. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to 100% disabled veteran motor vehicle tax exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-05-27HouseHouse concurred
2021-05-10SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue
2021-05-10SenateRules suspended
2021-03-25SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S1907 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2883 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3640 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2419 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H1152 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Senate concurred
H3430 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1180 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S2372 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - New draft substituted, see S2797
S1777 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1592 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S906 (Similar To) 2021-09-01 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2420 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback