MA S1334 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to window guards in residential rental properties. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to window guards in residential rental properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S798 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S445 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539
H4539 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2697 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - See H4851
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S445 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2463
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H460 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
H4517 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Published as amended, see H4539
H4539 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
S2610 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2697 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - See H4851
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1334.pdf |