MA H460 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2230
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mrs. Poirier of North Attleborough, a petition of Elizabeth A. Poirier and others that the Department of Environmental Protection be directed to revise regulations to protect and preserve the camping industry. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve to protect and preserve family camping in Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. William Crocker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2230 |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S414 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2230
H2134 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3566 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H3567 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H3568 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H2427 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2428 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H437 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2118 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2130 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
S2230 (Replaced by) 2017-12-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2134 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3566 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H3567 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H3568 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4527
H2427 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2428 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H437 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2118 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2130 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
S2230 (Replaced by) 2017-12-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H460 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H460.pdf |