MA S1066 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent wage theft, promote employer accountability, and enhance public enforcement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06JointHearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H1533 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S913 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S501 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1293 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H550 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1062 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S2165 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1633 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S313 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3302 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1525 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1326 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1498 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1234 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback