MA H1498 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to harassment prevention orders. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to harassment prevention orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H1533 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H550 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1740 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1893 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3347 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S997 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S913 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - House concurred
S860 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3302 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S501 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback