MA S860 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2496

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2496
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S1140 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
S272 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S997 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1155 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H626 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H1259 (Similar To) 2019-12-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2
H1148 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1445 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3302 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H603 (Similar To) 2020-08-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4401
H2657 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2343 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - New draft substituted, see S2367
S2367 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2020
H1338 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1253 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H3812 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback