MA H550 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to school dropout prevention and re-engagement. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to dropout prevention and re-engagement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H515 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H400 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H439 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1839 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S255 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2398
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S235 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback