MA S255 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2398

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish food allergy plans. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish food allergy plans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2398
2019-05-24JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H35 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1262 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
S941 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
S525 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2134 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H2194 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S227 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in The Gloucester House
S648 (Similar To) 2019-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1184 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2001 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2398 (Replaced by) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback