MA H1184 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-8)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further rate equity, access to, and affordability through equitable commercial health plan rates of reimbursement to community hospitals. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For equity for high value community hospitals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1086 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S694 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2217 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback