MA S2217 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further rate equity, access, and affordability in community hospitals. Health Care Financing.
Title
Furthering rate equity, access, and affordability in community hospitals
Sponsors
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Joseph Boncore [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. Barry Finegold [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-05-06 | House | House concurred |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S758 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H1525 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S694 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1086 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S758 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H1525 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S694 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1086 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2217 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2217.pdf |