MA H3347 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2954 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H597 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3349 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2542 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S49 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H1752 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H2622 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H123 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H716 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback