MA S913 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote homelessness prevention in Massachusetts. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure right to counsel in eviction proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-10SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-05-21HouseHouse concurred
2020-05-18SenateReporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1533 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2043 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - New draft substituted, see S2555
H1358 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence
S501 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2165 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S1633 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S313 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence
H3302 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1525 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1326 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2765
H1498 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1234 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback