MA S2165 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2551
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent the first use of nuclear weapons by the United States. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Resolutions to prevent the first use of nuclear weapons by the United States
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Tami Gouveia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2551 |
2019-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1533 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S501 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H550 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1525 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1326 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2765
H1498 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1234 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2551 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S501 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H550 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3302 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1525 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1326 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2765
H1498 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1234 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2551 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2165 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2165.pdf |