MA S1525 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H2209

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide diabetes prevention program benefits. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide diabetes prevention program benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-11-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-11-18SenateAccompanied by H2209
2019-07-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1310 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H821 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4229
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S997 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3354 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S85 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1623 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S760 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S377 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2022 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred
H2069 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2341 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4193 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2209 (Replaces) 2019-11-18 - Accompanied S1525
H4218 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
S2426 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback