MA S2426 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S48
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to an agricultural healthy incentives program. (Senate, No. 2426).
Title
Relative to an agricultural healthy incentives program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-12-02 | Senate | New draft of S48 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S48 (Replaces) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2426
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
H135 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H136 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H145 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4232
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
H135 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H136 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H145 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4232
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2426 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2426.pdf |