MA H145 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 91-10)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing within the Department of Transitional Assistance an agricultural healthy incentives program operated in partnership with the Department of Agricultural Resources and the Department of Public Health. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to an agricultural healthy incentives program

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]
Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Thomas Golden [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Sen. Adam Hinds [D]
Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Donald Humason [R]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]
Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-26HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4232
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H2270 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H4232 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback