MA H136 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to education or training activities for purposes of meeting the Department of Transitional Assistance work requirement for applicants seeking certain master’s degrees. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to education or training activities for purposes of meeting the Department of Transitional Assistance work requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H135 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2271 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S49 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2724
S2236 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H2271 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S74 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S49 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2724
S2236 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H136.pdf |