MA H4218 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding breakfast after the bell

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding breakfast after the bell

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-28 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 239 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #158 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 134 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-04 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2020
2020-07-28SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-07-28HouseEnacted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 239)
2020-07-28SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-07-28HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-07-28SenateSenate concurred in the further House amendment
2020-07-28SenateRules suspended
2020-07-27HouseAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of H4896
2020-07-27HouseBills in the Third Reading special report accepted
2020-01-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
2020-01-16SenatePassed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #158 (Yeas 35 to Nays 0)
2020-01-16SenateReprinted as amended, see S2473
2020-01-16SenateRead third
2020-01-16SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-16SenateAmended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2460, amended
2020-01-16SenateRead second
2020-01-10SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2020
2020-01-10SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2460
2020-01-10SenateAccompanied by S267
2020-01-09SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2019-11-21SenateRead; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-11-20HousePassed to be engrossed - 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No.134)
2019-11-20HouseRead third
2019-11-20HouseRules suspended
2019-11-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-20HouseNew draft of H591
2019-11-20HousePending new draft of H591
2019-11-20HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H591 (Replaces) 2019-11-20 - New draft substituted, see H4218
S267 (Replaces) 2020-01-15 - Accompanied H4218
S2473 (Replaces) 2020-01-16 - See H4218

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback