MA S1633 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to minimize youth vaping and support addiction prevention services. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To minimize youth vaping and support addiction prevention services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1312 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1129 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1750 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1752 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S353 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1098 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S52 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2306 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2357 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4185 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Adopted
H4183 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Published as amended, see H4196
H4196 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4226 (Similar To) 2019-11-20 - Text of an amendment, see H4196
H4257 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback