MA H1002 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to access to telemedicine services. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding access to telemedicine services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H2431 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H637 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1095 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H991 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H1916 (Similar To) 2019-08-15 - Senate concurred
H584 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4434

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback