MA S52 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S61
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied S61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied S61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to eligibility for disability services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to eligibility for disability services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Accompanied S61 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S814 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2526
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H624 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S364
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S647 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S61 (Replaced by) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2371 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H624 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Accompanied S364
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S647 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S61 (Replaced by) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S52 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S52.pdf |