MA S2043 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2555
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - New draft substituted, see S2555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - New draft substituted, see S2555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide identification to homeless youth and families. Transportation.
Title
To provide identification to homeless youth and families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2555 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2555 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1173 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1951 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2990 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H243 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H516 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Senate concurred
S2555 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2576
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S913 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1173 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1951 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3066 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2990 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H243 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H516 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Senate concurred
S2555 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2576
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2043 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2043.pdf |