MA H704 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5101
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require students to provide reasons for choosing to attend a school outside of his or her resident district. Education.
Title
Regarding school choice
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5101 |
2021-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
Same As/Similar To
S2496 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5101 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H619 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
S2493 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H4110 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1464 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2781
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S371 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5101 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S356 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
H619 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5143
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H704 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H704.pdf |