MA S332 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H653

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to carbon monoxide detectors in schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to carbon monoxide detectors in schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseAccompanied H653
2021-05-17JointHearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H653 (Replaced by) 2021-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4059 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2516 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4110 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2535 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S791 (Similar To) 2021-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1464 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S383 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S217 (Similar To) 2021-07-27 - Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S371 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S315 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S99 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S322 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback