MA S99 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to foster children school enrollment. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to foster kids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23JointHearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S2516 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4110 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1464 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S383 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S371 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S103 (Similar To) 2021-11-29 - Hearing scheduled for 12/06/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S322 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S323 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback