CA SB1297 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-08-15 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 70615 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Article 4 (commencing with Section 22435) of Chapter 7 of Division 11 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
The City of Malibu’s speed safety system pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1297 Allen et al (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1297 Allen et al (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 4026.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3978.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1. Page 3536.) (April 9). |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 70615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22435 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |