MA S333 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2756
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish funds to provide for increases in English language learners in school districts. Education.
Title
Establishing funds to provide for increases in English language learners in school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2756 |
2021-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
H3999 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S313 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H691 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S325 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2756 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2214 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
H3999 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S313 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H691 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4542
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S325 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2756 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2214 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S327 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S333 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S333.pdf |