MA H66 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To protect the Commonwealth from dangerous persons

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect the Commonwealth from dangerous persons

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08JointHearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-17HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H54 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H849 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H1626 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H332 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1633 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1437 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S520 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2155 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1055 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1340 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S185 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1985 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S893 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S968 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback