PA SB739 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Act No. 42 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for telemedicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for telemedicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 739 PN 1670, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 739 PN 1670, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04588 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Health: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 739 PN 1590, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 739 PN 981, 2023 A4347, VOGEL Amendment No. A-4347 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A01268 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-03SenateAct No. 42 of 2024
2024-07-03SenateApproved by the Governor
2024-06-27SenatePresented to the Governor
2024-06-27SenateSigned in House
2024-06-26SenateSigned in Senate
2024-06-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-1)
2024-06-25SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2024-06-25SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2024-06-24SenateIn the Senate
2024-06-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-8)
2024-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2024-06-12HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-06-12HouseSecond consideration
2024-06-11HouseRemoved from table
2024-06-03HouseLaid on the table
2024-06-03HouseFirst consideration
2024-06-03HouseReported as amended
2024-05-21HouseRe-referred to INSURANCE
2024-05-21HouseReported with request to re-refer to INSURANCE
2024-05-09HouseReferred to HEALTH
2024-05-08HouseIn the House
2024-05-08SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-1)
2024-05-07SenateAmended on third consideration (50-0)
2024-05-07SenateRe-reported as committed
2023-10-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-10-04SenateSecond consideration
2023-06-27SenateFirst consideration
2023-06-27SenateReported as amended
2023-06-02SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=739
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0739&pn=0824
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0739&pn=0981
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0739&pn=1590
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0739&pn=1670
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=S&type=B&bn=0739&pn=0824&aYear=2023&an=01268
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=S&type=B&bn=0739&pn=0981&aYear=2023&an=04347
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=S&type=B&bn=0739&pn=1590&aYear=2023&an=04588
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/SB0739P0981.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/SB0739P1670.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/27/2023&RollCallId=372
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/27/2023&RollCallId=371
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=458
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/07/2024&RollCallId=905
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=470
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/21/2024&RollCallId=1750
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=06/03/2024&RollCallId=1795
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=06/03/2024&RollCallId=1796
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=06/24/2024&RollCallId=2013
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1258
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/25/2024&RollCallId=1102
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=537

Bill Comments

feedback