MA S2155 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2551

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prohibit nuclear weapons. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolutions relative to the prohibition of nuclear weapons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2551
2019-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S1516 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2165 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S2157 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H2202 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3211 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3240 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2551 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback