MA H64 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H96

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Financing the reconstruction of the Soldiers’ Home in Holyoke

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financing the reconstruction of the Soldiers’ Home in Holyoke

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H96
2021-03-09JointHearing scheduled for 03/16/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-02-18SenateSenate concurred
2021-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H96 (Replaced by) 2021-04-14 - New draft substituted, see H3701
H3770 (Similar To) 2021-07-01 - Section 5 passed over veto -see Roll Call #52 (Yeas 37 to Nays 3)
H3701 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Reported by H3770
H102 (Similar To) 2021-04-14 - Rejected
H99 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2021
H3934 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - House concurred
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback