MA H102 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H96

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Financing the reconstruction of the Soldiers' Home in Holyoke

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financing the reconstruction of the Soldiers' Home in Holyoke

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseRejected
2021-04-12HousePending new draft of H96
2021-04-12HouseReported from the committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets

Same As/Similar To

H96 (Replaces) 2021-04-14 - New draft substituted, see H3701
H3770 (Similar To) 2021-07-01 - Section 5 passed over veto -see Roll Call #52 (Yeas 37 to Nays 3)
H3701 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Reported by H3770
H64 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H96
H99 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2021
H3934 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1690 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback