MA H99 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to a vacancy in the office of mayor in the city of Holyoke. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the Acting Mayor of Holyoke

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2021
2021-04-05SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2021-04-05HouseEnacted
2021-04-05SenateRead, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended
2021-04-05HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
2021-04-05HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-04-05HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2021-04-01SenateSenate concurred
2021-04-01HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H3770 (Similar To) 2021-07-01 - Section 5 passed over veto -see Roll Call #52 (Yeas 37 to Nays 3)
H3744 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - House concurred
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H65 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Adopted, in concurrence
H3701 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Reported by H3770
H3934 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - House concurred
H4230 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Consolidated with H4299

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback