MA H3934 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5284
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for the recall of elected officials in the city of Holyoke. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the recall of elected officials in the city of Holyoke
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5284 |
2022-04-19 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-07-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3746 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2021
H5284 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5284 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3934 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3934.pdf |